CA AB972 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3203 of, and to add Sections 3017, 3017.1, 3017.2, and 3017.3 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to oil and gas.
Title
Oil and gas: hydraulic fracturing: moratorium.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 972 BUTLER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 972 BUTLER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2012-08-13 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-07-03 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-28 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2012-06-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 26). | |
2012-06-18 | Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. | |
2012-06-14 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-08-25 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-11 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-29 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 22). | |
2011-06-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1706.) | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-11 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11834.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3017 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3017.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3017.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3017.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3203.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |