CA AB971 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 209, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 209, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 5.6 (commencing with Section 18754) of Chapter 3 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Personal income tax: voluntary contributions: California
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB971 Monning By Simitian (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 971 MONNING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 971 MONNING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 209, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-08-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-08-22 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 2009.). | |
2011-08-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 1657.) | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-25 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-15 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 11). | |
2011-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2011-04-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18753 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18754 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |