CA AB970 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 710, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 710, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65850.7 of, and to add Section 65850.71 to, the Government Code, relating to zoning.
Title
Planning and zoning: electric vehicle charging stations: permit application: approval.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 970 McCarty Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB970 McCarty et al. By Gonzalez (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 970 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB970 McCarty et al. By Gonzalez (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 970 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 710, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 11. Page 2832.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2359.). |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 8). |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 8. Page 1711.) |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65850.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65850.71 | New Code | See Bill Text |