CA AB968 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 78070) to Chapter 1 of Part 48 of Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: naturalist workforce model curriculum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 78070 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |