CA AB968 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10608, 10608.4, 10608.8, 10608.12, 10608.20, 10608.24 of, to add Sections 10608.25, 10608.46, and 10608.47 to, and to add and repeal Section 10608.45 of, the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Urban water use: water efficiency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 10608 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10608.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10608.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10608.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10608.25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 10608.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10608.45 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10608.46 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 10608.47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 10608.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10610 | Amended Code | Citation Text |