CA AB967 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 41570, 41580, 47604.32, 47604.33, 52059.5, 52060, 52061, 52062, 52063, 52064, 52064.1, 52065, 52070, 53013, and 53073 of, and to amend and repeal Section 47606.5 of, the Education Code, relating to school accountability.
Title
Local control and accountability plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 967 Smith Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB967 Smith By Durazo (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 967 Smith Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB967 Smith By Durazo (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 967 Smith Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-10-07 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 967.). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.) |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2710.). |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 2081.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 27). |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 41570 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 41580 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 47604.32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 47604.33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 47606.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52059.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52060 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52061 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52062 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52063 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52064 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52064.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52065 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52070 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 53013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 53073 | Amended Code | Citation Text |