CA AB964 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 522, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 522, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1798.29 and 1798.82 of the Civil Code, relating to civil law.
Title
Civil law: privacy.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-08 - Assembly - AB 964 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB964 Chau By Jackson (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB964 Chau By Jackson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB964 Chau By Jackson (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 964 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB964 Chau By Jackson (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB964 Chau By Jackson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB964 Chau By Jackson (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 964 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 522, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 11. Page 2946.). |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2472.). |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2330.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Jackson. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2332.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 7). |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 7. Page 1848.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1629.) |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 30). |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.82 | Amended Code | Citation Text |