CA AB963 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6592, 6901, 34010, 34011, 34012, 34013, 34014, 34015, 34016, and 34018 of, to add Sections 6369.6, 6471.5, 34011.51, 34011.52, 34011.53, 34011.54, 34011.55, 34011.56, 34011.57, 34014.1, 34016.05, 34016.1, 34016.11, 34016.12, 34016.13, 34016.14, and 34016.15 to, and to add Article 1.7 (commencing with Section 6480.50) to Chapter 5 of Part 1 of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Taxation: marijuana.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Gipson. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (May 26). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and B. & P. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |