CA AB963 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 782, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 782, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22115, 22119.2, 22119.3, 22119.5, 22146, 22164.5, 26113, and 26135.7 of, and to add Sections 22119.6, 22458.5, and 22508.7 to, the Education Code, relating to state teachers' retirement.
Title
Teachers' Retirement Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-03 - Assembly - AB 963 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB963 Bonilla By Pan (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - AB 963 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB963 Bonilla By Pan (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - AB 963 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 782, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2859.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2861.). |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2409.). |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 17). |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1349.) |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 22115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22119.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22119.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22119.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22119.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22146 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22164.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22458.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22458.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22508.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 26113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 26135.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |