CA AB962 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 63025.1 of the Government Code, and to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 1719.1) to Part 1 of Division 6 of the Harbors and Navigation Code, relating to harbors and ports.
Title
State infrastructure financing for seaports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 10). |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.) |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3677.) |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and J., E.D., & E. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 63025.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1719.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |