CA AB96 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on October 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 475, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2022 to the Fish and Game Code, and to repeal Section 5 of Chapter 692 of the Statutes of 1976, relating to animal parts and products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal parts and products: importation or sale of ivory and rhinoceros horn.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-04 - Assembly - AB 96 ATKINS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB96 Atkins By Lara (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 96 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-04 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 475, Statutes of 2015.
2015-10-04 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-16AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2015-09-04AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 2907.).
2015-09-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2015-09-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2394.).
2015-08-31SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
2015-07-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-06-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-17SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2015-06-11SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2015-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 14. Page 1776.)
2015-06-01AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 28).
2015-03-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
2015-03-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-01-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2015-01-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
2015-01-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code2022New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_96&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_96_bill_20150107_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_96_bill_20150617_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_96_bill_20150909_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_96_bill_20151004_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_96_vote_20150310_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_96_vote_20150528_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_96_vote_20150602_1142AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_96_vote_20150623_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_96_vote_20150706_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_96_vote_20150827_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_96_vote_20150902_1126AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_96_vote_20150904_1017AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback