CA AB96 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8.6 (commencing with Section 14515) to Part 3 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal, making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Keeping Adults Free from Institutions program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Assembly - AB 96 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB96 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) By DeSaulnier (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Assembly - AB 96 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2011-06-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB96 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) By DeSaulnier (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Assembly - AB 96 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-25 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2011-07-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:15 p.m. | |
2011-06-15 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 1950.). | |
2011-06-13 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-06-10 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 10.5 suspended by unanimous consent. (Page 1369.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1371.). | |
2011-06-08 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-04-11 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |
2011-04-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-06 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-03-16 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (March 16). Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-03-15 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-03-14 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-03-07 | Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-02-22 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-02-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 0. Page 415.) | |
2011-02-18 | Without reference to committee. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-01-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. | |
2011-01-10 | Read first time. To print. |