CA AB957 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 536, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 536, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 102051, 102100.2, 102161, 102281, 102332, 102333, and 102430 of, and to repeal Sections 102102, 102103, and 102580 of, the Public Utilities Code, to amend Sections 188.5, 339, and 525 of the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend Section 21100.4 of the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation omnibus bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-08 - Assembly - AB 957 TRANS. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By LOWENTHAL (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB957 Committee on TRANS. (Lowenthal) By DeSaulnier (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 957 TRANS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB957 Committee on TRANS. (Lowenthal) By DeSaulnier (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 957 TRANS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 536, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-08 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3080.). | |
2011-09-07 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2011-09-07 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2349.). | |
2011-09-01 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2011-07-07 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 5). | |
2011-06-28 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-06-02 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-05-26 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-05-12 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1355.) | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-04 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 102051 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102100.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102102 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102103 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102281 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102332 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102333 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102430 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102580 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 188.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 339 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 525 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 21100.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23123.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |