CA AB952 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 185, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 185, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 36512 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: vacancies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB952 Cristina Garcia By Lara (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 952 GARCIA, C. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Elections and Redistricting (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 952 GARCIA, C. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Elections and Redistricting (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 185, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1901.). |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1560.) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 13). |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E. & R. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 5091 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 1780 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 36512 | Amended Code | Citation Text |