CA AB950 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 118.8 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to streets and highways.
Title
Department of Transportation: sales of excess real property: affordable housing, emergency shelters, and feeding programs.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 950 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 950 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12). |
2021-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 13. Noes 4. Page 1722.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and E.Q. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1775.) |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1640.) |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 1581.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Received by the Desk April 30 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(2). |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 118.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |