CA AB949 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 45125.1 of the Education Code, relating to school employees.
Title
School employees: contracts: sole proprietors: criminal background checks.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB949 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 949 GIPSON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 949 GIPSON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:40 p.m. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1843.). |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1145.) |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 45125.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |