CA AB949 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10980 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
CalWORKs eligibility: fraudulent representations: fines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2011-04-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and PUB. S. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10980 | Amended Code | Citation Text |