CA AB948 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 352, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 352, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11340 and 11360 of, and to add Sections 11310.3 and 11424 to, the Business and Professions Code, to add Section 1102.6g to the Civil Code, and to amend Section 12955 of the Government Code, relating to real estate.
Title
Bureau of Real Estate Appraisers: disclosures: demographic information: reporting: continuing education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 948 Holden Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB948 Holden et al. By Eggman (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 948 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB948 Holden et al. By Eggman (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 948 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 352, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2832.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2341.). |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 26). |
2021-08-23 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 13). |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1775.) |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1640.) |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 1581.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 11310.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 11340 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 11360 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 11424 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1102.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12955 | Amended Code | Citation Text |