CA AB947 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 377, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 377, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 76141 of the Education Code, relating to nonresident tuition.
Title
Community colleges: nonresident tuition: foreign
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB947 Brownley By Pavley (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 947 BROWNLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 947 BROWNLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 377, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-02 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. | |
2009-08-27 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-08-27 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 1973.) | |
2009-06-30 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-29 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-06-17 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 17). | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 21. Page 1464.) | |
2009-05-04 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 29). | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 21). | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |