CA AB943 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 65863.15 to the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Land use regulations: local initiatives: voter approval.
Sponsors
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Asm. Autumn Burke [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Marc Steinorth [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 943 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 943 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2017-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 1802.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E. & R. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65863.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |