CA AB940 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Hearing: Mar 26 @ 1:30 pm Assembly Health Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 11831.6 and 11831.7 of, and to add Part 1.86 (commencing with Section 444.01) to Division 1 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to recovery residences.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recovery residences.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2019-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11831.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11831.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code444.01New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback