CA AB939 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 472, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 53075.5, 53075.51, and 53075.52 of the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government: taxicab transportation services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 939 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB939 Low By McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 939 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-18 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 472, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-18 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2018-08-29AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6786.)
2018-08-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on C. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5887.).
2018-08-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-21SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2018-06-07SenateRe-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H.
2018-05-31SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2018-05-31SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom inactive file.
2017-09-16SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
2017-08-24SenateOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-24SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2017-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1830.)
2017-05-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-04-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code14202Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53075.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53075.51Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53075.52Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback