CA AB939 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 352, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 352, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 215, 2030, 2032, 2034, 2330.3, 2400, 2403, 2450, 2451, 3027, 3121, 3150, 3151, 3183, 3557, 6323, and 6340 of, and to add Section 217 to, the Family Code, and to amend Section 328 of, and to add Section 827.10 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to family law proceedings.
Title
Family law proceedings.
Sponsors
Asm. Julia Brownley [D] | Sen. Noreen Evans [D] | Asm. Mike Feuer [D] | Asm. Dave Jones [D] |
Asm. Paul Krekorian [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Sen. William Monning [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-23 - Assembly - AB 939 JUD. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By FEUER (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB939 Committee on JUD. (Feuer) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - Assembly - AB 939 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB939 Committee on JUD. (Feuer) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - Assembly - AB 939 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 352, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-02 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m. | |
2010-08-23 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6463.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6482.) | |
2010-08-20 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4709.) | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-11 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-10 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 9). | |
2010-08-03 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. | |
2010-01-19 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-01-19 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3816.) | |
2010-01-13 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-01-12 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (January 12). | |
2010-01-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-04-28 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |