CA AB933 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 12 @ 10:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Division 20.4.5 (commencing with Section 30955) to the Public Resources Code, relating to resource protection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ecosystem resilience: watershed protection: watershed coordinators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 933 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-11SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9).
2019-06-19SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1947.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2019-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code30955New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback