CA AB932 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 786, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 786, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 8698.4 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Shelter crisis: homeless shelters.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] |
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Asm. Tony Thurmond [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 932 Ting Special Consent Calendar 1st Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB932 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 932 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB932 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 932 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 786, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3424.). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2910.). |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1777.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar by request of Assembly Member Ting. To Third Reading. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 17). |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8698.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |