CA AB93 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Hearing: Jun 5 @ 1:00 pm in Room 3191
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 728, 4980.01, 4980.03, 4980.35, 4980.397, 4980.399, 4980.40, 4980.42, 4980.43, 4980.44, 4980.50, 4980.78, 4980.79, 4982, 4982.15, 4984.01, 4984.7, 4992.05, 4992.09, 4992.3, 4996.17, 4996.18, 4996.23, 4999.12, 4999.36, 4999.42, 4999.46, 4999.50, 4999.51, 4999.52, 4999.55, 4999.62, 4999.63, and 4999.90 of, to amend and renumber Section 4980.45 of, to add Sections 4980.43.1, 4980.43.2, 4980.43.3, 4980.43.4, 4980.43.6, 4996.20, 4996.21, 4996.23.1, 4996.23.2, 4996.23.3, 4999.46.1, 4999.46.2, 4999.46.3, 4999.46.4, and 4999.46.5 to, and to repeal Sections 4996.24, 4999.34, 4999.44, 4999.45, 4999.455, and 4999.47 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 124260 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healing arts: marriage and family therapists: clinical social workers: professional clinical counselors: required experience and supervision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 93 MEDINA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2017-01-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-01-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
2017-01-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code4980.01Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.03Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.35Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.397Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.399Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.40Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.42Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.43Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.43.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4980.43.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4980.43.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4980.43.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4980.43.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4980.44Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.50Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.78Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.79Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4982Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4982.15Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4984.01Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4984.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4992.05Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4992.09Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4992.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4996.17Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4996.18Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4996.20New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4996.21New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4996.23Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4996.23.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4996.23.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4996.23.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4996.24Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.34Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.36Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.42Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.44Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.45Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.455Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.46Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.46.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4999.46.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4999.46.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4999.46.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4999.46.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4999.47Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.50Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.51Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.52Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.55Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.62Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.63Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.90Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code728Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code124260Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback