CA AB929 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 678, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 678, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 703.140, 703.150, and 704.730 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to debtor exemptions.
Title
Debtor exemptions: bankruptcy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Assembly - AB 929 WIECKOWSKI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB929 Wieckowski By Evans (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB929 Wieckowski Reconsider (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 929 WIECKOWSKI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB929 Wieckowski By Evans (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB929 Wieckowski Reconsider (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 929 WIECKOWSKI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 678, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:35 p.m. | |
2012-08-29 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 6529.). | |
2012-08-28 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-28 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 4909.). | |
2012-08-24 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-04-10 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-09 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-09-08 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Evans. | |
2011-09-07 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 16. Page 2366.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Evans. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2366.) | |
2011-09-01 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25). | |
2011-06-27 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-14 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-05-19 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 1474.) | |
2011-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 11). | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 703.140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 703.150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 704.730 | Amended Code | Citation Text |