CA AB926 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6217.8 of the Public Resources Code, relating to oil revenue, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oil revenue: Oil Trust Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 926 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2073.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2019-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code6217.8Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback