CA AB925 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 632.7 of, and to add Section 632.8 to, the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Intentional recording of telephonic communication.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 5). |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 632 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 632.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 632.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |