CA AB921 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65865.5, 65962, and 66474.5 of, and to add Section 65962.2 to, the Government Code, to add Sections 12670.5 and 50600.1 to the Water Code, and to add Section 1.5 to Chapter 100 of the Statutes of 1911, relating to flood protection.
Title
Flood protection: City of West Sacramento flood risk reduction project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-18 - Assembly - AB 921 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 0. Page 3325.) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member McCarty. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member McCarty. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65865.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65962 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65962.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 66474.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 12670.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 50600.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |