CA AB920 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 454.51, 454.52, and 9621 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Electricity: procurement plans: integrated resource plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 920 AGUIAR-CURRY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 920 AGUIAR-CURRY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2045.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 24). |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 399.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.16.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 454.51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 454.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 9621 | Amended Code | Citation Text |