CA AB92 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 218, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 218, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to state claims, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB92 De Leon Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 92 DE LEON Third Reading Urgency (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 92 DE LEON Third Reading Urgency (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 218, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-08-31 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 5:15 p.m. | |
2009-08-25 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-08-24 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1919.) | |
2009-07-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-30 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 29). | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1867.) | |
2009-05-26 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20). | |
2009-05-13 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-11 | Referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-01-07 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. | |
2009-01-06 | Read first time. To print. |