CA AB918 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 845, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 4000.5, 4001.5, 4005, 12303, 14200, 14201, and 14282 of, to add Section 4005.6 to, and to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 13400) to Division 13 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Voting for All Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 918 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB918 Bonta et al. By Lara (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 918 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 845, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2017-09-14AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 12. Page 3377.).
2017-09-13AssemblyAssembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
2017-09-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-12SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2754.).
2017-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
2017-08-28SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-07-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 11. Page 1964.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 26).
2017-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2017-03-29AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code12303Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code14200Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code14201Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code14282Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code3010.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code4000.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code4001.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code4005Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code4005.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code4005.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback