CA AB916 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 17053.72 and 23672 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: California work opportunity tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 916 QUIRK-SILVA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 916 QUIRK-SILVA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1720.) |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 17). |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.72 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23672 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 14000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 14206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |