CA AB916 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-23 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-23 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 11050) to Part 1 of Division 3 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to undocumented workers, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Undocumented workers: California Agricultural and
Sponsors
Asm. K H Achadjian [R] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Bill Berryhill [R] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] |
Asm. Gilbert Cedillo [D] | Asm. Henry Perea [D] | Asm. Manuel Perez [D] | Sen. Michael Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 916 PEREZ, V.M. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 916 PEREZ, V.M. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-08-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-07-05 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-07-03 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). | |
2012-06-21 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-05-31 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-02-02 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 1799.) | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-04-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-03-29 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1216 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127645 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 11050 | New Code | See Bill Text |