CA AB915 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 399.12, 399.15, and 399.30 of, and to add and repeal Section 917 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to renewable resources.
Title
California Renewables Portfolio Standards Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Chad Mayes [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 399.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 917 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB915 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB915 |