CA AB913 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 425.56 and 425.57 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Construction-related accessibility claims: extremely high-frequency litigants.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 425.56 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 425.57 | New Code | See Bill Text |