CA AB911 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1255.23 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to hospitals, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospitals: closures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2016-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2016-01-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
2015-04-28AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-04-21AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-04-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-04-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2015-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-02-27AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
2015-02-26AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1255.23New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback