CA AB91 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-27 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-27 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14556.5, 16773, and 16965 of the Government Code, to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 185500) to Division 19.5 of, and to repeal and add Section 99310.6 of, the Public Utilities Code, to amend Section 7105 of, and to repeal and add Section 7104.3 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 183 and 183.1 of the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend Sections 9400.1, 9400.4, and 42205 of the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 91 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1363.) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 1337.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1397.) |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1312.) Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1313.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1314.) |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14556.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16773 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16965 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 185500 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7104.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 183 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 183.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 42205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 9400.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 9400.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |