CA AB909 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 26 @ 9:00 am Assembly Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1714.27 to the Civil Code, and to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 19305) to Part 3 of Division 13 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency response.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency response: trauma kits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2017-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-30AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-28AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1714.27New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1797.161New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code19305New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback