CA AB909 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 680.1 to the Penal Code, relating to sexual assault crimes.
Title
Sexual assault crimes.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Autumn Burke [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 909 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 909 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1785.) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 28). |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 680.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |