CA AB909 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 11.8 (commencing with Section 14190.15) to Part 4 of the Penal Code, relating to metal theft.
Title
Metal theft and related recycling crimes.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Assembly - AB 909 GRAY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB909 Gray By Berryhill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 909 GRAY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB909 Gray By Berryhill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 909 GRAY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2014-01-06 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2013-10-03 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2013-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3130.). |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2240.). |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1811.) |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 14190.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |