CA AB907 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 52334.7 to the Education Code, relating to career technical education, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Career training: adult students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 907 BURKE Third Reading Urgency (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and B., P. & E.D. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1720.). |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 52334.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |