CA AB906 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 339, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 339, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 102100.9 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transit.
Title
Sacramento Regional Transit District.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-27 - Assembly - AB 906 COOPER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB906 Cooper By Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 906 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB906 Cooper By Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 906 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 339, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2614.). |
2015-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2152.). |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 14). |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 1760.) |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 6). |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 102100.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |