CA AB905 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 168, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1714, 1716, 1717, 1730, 1731, 1732, 1733, 1737, and 1741 of, to amend the heading of Title 11 (commencing with Section 1710.10) of Part 3 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 1 (commencing with Section 1710.10) of Title 11 of Part 3 of, to add Section 1725 to, to add the heading of Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 1730) of Title 11 of Part 3 to, and to repeal Sections 1714 and 1742 of, and to repeal the heading of Title 11.5 (commencing with Section 1730) of Part 3 of, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Money judgments of other jurisdictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB905 Maienschein By Stern (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 905 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 168, Statutes of 2017.
2017-08-07 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-31AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2017-07-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-07-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2126.).
2017-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-26SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1145.)
2017-04-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5).
2017-03-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-13AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback