CA AB901 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-26 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 12. Page 5228.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 48263, 48267, 48268, and 48269 of the Education Code, and to amend Sections 236, 601, 601.3,653.5, and 654 of, and to add Section 651.5 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juveniles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-26 - Assembly - AB 901 Gipson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB901 Gipson et al. By Beall (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - That the measure be held in committee pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 901 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 27 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-26 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 12. Page 5228.).
2020-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 323, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2020-08-31AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2020-08-26AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 12.).
2020-08-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2020-08-24SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 7.).
2020-08-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-13SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-07-29SenateOrdered to third reading.
2020-07-29SenateFrom committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 29)
2020-03-18SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-09-11SenateIn committee: That the measure be held in committee pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
2019-09-09SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-09-09SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2019-08-19SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-08-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 10).
2019-07-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and ED.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 27. Page 2113.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 16).
2019-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2019-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback