CA AB901 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 713, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 713, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 23725 to the Government Code, relating to local elections.
Title
County of San Diego: local elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB901 Gloria et al. By Atkins (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 901 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 901 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 713, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2324.). |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 20). |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 1534.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 10). |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 21550 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 23725 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 25001 | New Code | See Bill Text |