CA AB900 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 13957 and 13957.5 of the Government Code, relating to crime victims, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crime victims: the California Victim Compensation Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 900 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-01-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-01-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3863.)
2018-01-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-22AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-01-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18).
2017-06-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code13957Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13957.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback