CA AB900 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 6.5 (commencing with Section 21178) of Division 13 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
Jobs and Economic Improvement Through Environmental
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] | Asm. Joan Buchanan [D] | Sen. Ronald Calderon [D] | Asm. Richard Gordon [D] |
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Sen. Michael Rubio [D] | Sen. Darrell Steinberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Assembly - AB 900 BUCHANAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB900 Buchanan By Steinberg (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB900 Buchanan Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB900 Buchanan By Steinberg (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB900 Buchanan Urgency Clause (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 900 SWANSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB900 Buchanan By Steinberg (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB900 Buchanan Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB900 Buchanan By Steinberg (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB900 Buchanan Urgency Clause (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 900 SWANSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-09-09 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 15. Page 3217.). Measure version as amended on September 9 corrected. | |
2011-09-09 | Motion to take up the bill without reference to file by unanimous consent. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2466.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2466.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Steinberg. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2467.) Reconsideration of favorable vote granted. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembl | |
2011-09-09 | In Senate. Held at Desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time and passed. | |
2011-09-09 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-09-09 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (September 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Page 2438.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 2442.). | |
2011-09-08 | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 2408.) Pursuant to Joint Rules 33.1, Joint Rule 61(a)(12) suspended. (Page 2420.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2420.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 1656.) | |
2011-05-27 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-11 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-10 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 2). | |
2011-04-27 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2011-04-26 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 13). | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and NAT. RES. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 32377 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21178 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |