CA AB9 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 225, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 8654.4, 51177, 51178, 51178.5, 51179, 51181, 51182, and 65302 of the Government Code, to amend Section 13108.5 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 702, 4202, 4203, 4204, and 4291 of, to add Section 4124.8 to, to add Articles 11 (commencing with Section 4208) and 12 (commencing with Section 4209) to Chapter 1 of Part 2 of Division 4 of, and to repeal Section 4209.3 of, the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 8386.3 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to fire safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire safety and prevention: wildfires: fire adapted communities: Office of the State Fire Marshal: community wildfire preparedness and mitigation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 9 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB9 Wood By Limón (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 9 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-23 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 225, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-23 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
2021-09-09AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2021-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
2021-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-02SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-09-01SenateOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-01SenateFrom special consent calendar.
2021-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-14SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 13).
2021-07-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2021-06-30SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2021-04-19AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 14).
2021-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-04-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code51177Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code51178Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code51178.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code51179Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code51181Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code51182Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65302Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8654.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code13108.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4124.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code4202Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4203Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4204Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4209.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4291Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code702Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8386.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB9
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB9#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB9#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB9#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB9#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB9#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB9#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB9#93AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB9#92AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB9#91ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB9#90CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB9

Bill Comments

feedback